Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Premium Financing
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including motor clubs and motor club memberships in specified provisions relating to premium financing; altering the maximum amount of a finance charge and the method of calculating the charge; providing for a refund credit to be calculated in a specified manner; altering specified delinquency and collection and cancellation charges; authorizing the inclusion of previous premium financing agreements in the calculation of amounts due on the account of an insured; making conforming changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Insurance - Premium Financing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-101, 23-201, 23-301, 23-304, 23-306, 23-307, 23-307.1, 23-401.1, 23-402, 23-403, 23-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM