Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of compensation from $7,500 to $9,000 for the president and from $6,500 to $8,000 for other voting members of the Carroll County Board of Education; and providing that the Act does not apply to the compensation of the president or other voting members of the county board during a certain term of office.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0885
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM