Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; providing that certain individuals are not eligible to participate in the optional retirement program if they elect to participate in the cash balance plan; authorizing participation in the cash balance plan for certain individuals hired on or after July 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 23-203, 23-204, 23-208, 30-302, 33-101 through 33-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM