Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to implement, by law, a specified property tax credit that may not exceed a specified amount under specified circumstances; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to adopt specified requirements and procedures to carry out a specified program; requiring a specified value to be determined by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring a specified value to be determined by specified professional appraisers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0876
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 47
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM