Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a Class A beer license, a Class A beer and light wine license, or a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license to sell specified alcoholic beverages during specified hours under specified circumstances in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a 2-day Sunday sales permit to holders of specified licenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 42
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-102, 9-2002, 9-2003, 9-2004, 9-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM