Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Ferguson, Conway, McFadden, Gladden, and Pugh
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue bonds to finance the construction of or improvements to specified Baltimore City public school facilities in accordance with a specified 10-year plan for Baltimore City Public Schools and subject to specified limitations; specifying that the Authority and the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners shall be responsible for specified public school facilities construction and improvement projects; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0860
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399739/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {743827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {399739/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {743827/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-629 through 10-633, 10-634, 10-635, 10-636, 10-639, 10-645, 10-646, 10-656, 10-657 )
(   4-115, 4-306.1, 4-306.2, 5-202, 5-301 )
(   9-120, 9-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM