Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer Information
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Oaks, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain entity that provides certain coverage for certain contraceptive drugs and devices under certain health insurance policies or contracts to develop a contraceptive coverage information document for certain plans; requiring that the contraceptive coverage document include certain information; and requiring a certain entity to make the contraceptive coverage information document available to certain consumers on certain websites and as part of certain information filed with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0780
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer Information
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-826 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM