Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider to disclose a specified medical record in accordance with compulsory process no later than 30 days after receiving specified documentation.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Disclosure of Medical Records - Compulsory Process - Timeline
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM