Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, in adopting specified vegetation management regulations, to require that an electric company's vegetation management program comply with the International Society of Arboriculture's Best Management Practices for Utility Pruning of Trees; and prohibiting an electric company from removing a tree on private property unless the tree is hazardous and the private property owner has consented to removal of the hazardous tree.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0611
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM