Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date to September 30, 2022, for certain provisions of law authorizing certain hybrid vehicles to use a certain high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under certain circumstances; extending the termination date to September 30, 2022 for certain provisions of law making certain requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 45
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 69
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-108 )
(   2010, 2013, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM