Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain lending institution that makes a certain loan secured by a certain first mortgage or first deed of trust to create a certain escrow account solely for the payment of water and sewer facilities assessments on a certain request; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to the payment of water and sewer facilities assessments under a certain direct reduction method; providing that funds in a certain escrow account for use for certain purposes may not be used in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {837479/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Economic Matters 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
(   12-1026, 12-109, 12-109.1, 13-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page