Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez and Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an employee to provide specified written notice to a specified employer first in order to establish a lien for unpaid wages; authorizing a specified employer to dispute a lien for unpaid wages by filing a specified complaint in a specified circuit court in a specified manner; authorizing the employer or employee to request an evidentiary hearing; requiring a circuit court to make a determination on a claim to establish a lien for unpaid wages in a specified manner; authorizing a circuit court to take specified actions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1130
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838275/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {838275/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 55A
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1101 through 3-1110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM