Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Manno, Pugh, Raskin, Middleton, Astle, Kelley, Feldman, Mathias, Jennings, Hershey, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to provide a supplement to increase the total benefit to $30 per month to a household that includes an individual who is at least 62 years old and receives a federally funded benefit in an amount less than $30 per month under the food stamp program.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584060/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-16)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {207079/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Appropriations 47
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {584060/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-16) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM