Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Benson, Feldman, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Ramirez, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified procedures for suspending or dismissing specified public school personnel; authorizing specified public school personnel to request arbitration under specified circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; assigning responsibility to the individual for 25% of the cost and expenses of the arbitration and 75% to the county board; and providing that an arbitrator's award is final and binding on the parties, subject to review by a circuit court.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Grounds for Discipline
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864532/1
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Grounds for Discipline
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Grounds for Discipline
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Adopted (32-14) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Grounds for Discipline
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page