Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Brochin, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force on the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1105
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {339634/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524266/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {339634/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {524266/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM