Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing student journalists at public schools and public institutions of higher education to exercise freedom of speech and freedom of the press in school-sponsored media; specifying that these freedoms are not limited by the fact that the media is supported financially by the school system, the school, or the institution of higher education, or by use of the facilities of the school; prohibiting student media advisors from using their position to influence a student journalist to promote specified positions; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {573427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894963/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {123825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Motion Withdrawn Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-8)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {573427/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {894963/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {123825/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Motion Withdrawn Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933720/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-8) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-119, 7-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM