Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture - Equitable Sharing of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a forfeiting authority or seizing authority from receiving the proceeds of, or entering into an equitable sharing agreement with a federal agency to receive the proceeds of, certain property that is forfeited under federal law; and repealing a certain requirement that a seizing authority, in consultation with a certain forfeiting authority, report on an annual basis the amount the seizing authority received in the prior year from the federal government as part of an equitable sharing agreement.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture - Equitable Sharing of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture - Equitable Sharing of Proceeds
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-102, 12-403, 12-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM