Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Continuation Coverage - Change in Employment Status
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from 18 to 36 months, under certain circumstances, the period of time for which certain group contracts are required to provide continuation coverage for insureds who have experienced a change in status as the result of termination of employment other than for cause; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0086
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Continuation Coverage - Change in Employment Status
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Continuation Coverage - Change in Employment Status
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM