Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate Determination
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Manno, Currie, Edwards, Serafini, and Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, when determining the rate of the agricultural land transfer tax to be imposed, the amount of agricultural land transferred that is exempt from the tax in accordance with specified provisions of law may not be included in the amount of agricultural land that is transferred.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {939737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {939737/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM