Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing another to engage in certain sexual activity or in the production of a certain visual representation or performance by making certain threats; prohibiting a person from knowingly distributing a certain visual representation; establishing and applying certain penalties for violation of the Act; authorizing a sentence imposed under the Act to be separate from and consecutive to or concurrent with a sentence for any other crime based on the action establishing a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {442518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-5)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {228179/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Judiciary 45
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {442518/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (132-5) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-709, 3-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM