Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transit Benefit Districts
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Transit Administration to establish no more than two transit benefit districts; authorizing a transit benefit district to impose specified taxes to finance, construct, and operate transit facilities and transit services; providing for the makeup of the governing body of a transit benefit district; requiring a specified public hearing before the establishment of a transit benefit district; providing transit benefit districts with specified power and authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2014 Text - First - Transit Benefit Districts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101 through 9-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM