Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology Transfer
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Senators Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Peters, Pugh, Rosapepe, Serafini, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology Transfer; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to review, study, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Referred Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 23
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Referred Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 23
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM