Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a State plan amendment to the Family Planning Program; altering from 6 to 12 months the time period for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives under certain programs; requiring, by October 1, 2020, the Department, along with the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, to establish a presumptive eligibility process and integrate a certain process for the Family Planning Program into the Maryland Health Connection, etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {707173/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-140, 15-148 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM