Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Telemedicine Task Force - Maryland Health Care Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pipkin, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Maryland Health Care Commission, in conjunction with the Maryland Health Quality and Cost Council, continue to study the use of telehealth throughout the State through the Telemedicine Task Force; requiring the Task Force to consist of specified advisory groups and undertake specified activities; and requiring the Commission to submit specified reports of the Task Force to the Governor and specified legislative committees.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866884/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {747571/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {866884/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM