Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Natural Gas Infrastructure Expansion and Reinforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Hershey, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a gas company to defer specified costs for specified projects to extend specified natural gas transmission pipeline, distribution main pipeline, system reinforcement facilities, and associated facilities; specifying the circumstances under which a specified expansion project qualifies for deferral of specified costs; specifying the manner in which a gas company is required to account for specified costs; requiring the Commission to take specified action during a specified base rate proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-211, 4-212, 4-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM