Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to coordinate with certain entities to identify and implement certain language developmental milestones on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the Department to develop a certain parent resource that meets certain specifications on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the Statewide Coordinator to make a certain parent resource available or distribute certain milestones in a certain way; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 through 8-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM