Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding alternative financial investment bonds and to create a certain model investment instrument for the State; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and General Assembly by January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM