Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Automatic Step Increases - Standard Pay Plan
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted by the Secretary of Budget and Management provide for automatic increases from minimum to maximum steps in a pay grade of pay rates in the Standard Pay Plan for State employees for an employee whose overall performance is rated satisfactory or above on the employee's annual performance appraisal; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437377/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437377/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-16)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {437377/1 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {437377/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/26/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (123-16) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM