Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Cassilly, and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class MT (movie theater) license in Harford County; authorizing the Harford County Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to an owner of a movie theater; requiring the owner of a movie theater to provide documentation to the Board that the owner has made an investment of at least $250,000 in the movie theater to be eligible for the license; specifying that the license entitles the holder to sell beer, wine and liquor for on-premises consumption from 4 P.M. to midnight on the days the theater is open; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953197/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {974234/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 42
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {953197/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM