Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Ferguson, Kelley, Montgomery, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing any rebates received by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program to be used to provide specified services to eligible individuals under Part B of the federal Ryan White HIV/AIDS Program.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 49
House 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM