Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Feldman, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, King, McFadden, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a firefighter, an emergency medical technician, a rescue squad member, or any other first responder engaged in providing emergency medical care or rescue services; and applying specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM