Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias and Eckardt
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Raising in Wicomico County from 22,500 to 45,000 the limit on the number of barrels of malt beverages that a micro-brewery may collectively brew, bottle, or contract for in a calendar year.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654332/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {654332/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 48
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM