Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited Actions
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Forehand, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the types of actions that a landlord of residential property may not take to include refusing to renew a lease for specified reasons under specified provisions of landlord-tenant law concerning retaliatory actions.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM