Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teach It Forward Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Benson, Colburn, Currie, Jones-Rodwell, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Montgomery, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop the Maryland Teach It Forward Pilot Program that allows specified students at a specified public institution of higher education to enroll without paying tuition or fees and requires specified students to enter into a binding contract to make specified payments for up to 20 years after graduating; requiring the Commission to select one public institution of higher education to participate in a specified program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM