Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a program to control the spread of black flies in the State; requiring that the program be implemented initially on specified property in Washington County; requiring the Department, in conjunction with the Department of Entomology in the University of Maryland, to conduct the program in a specified manner; authorizing the Department to accept, use, or expend any aid, gift, or grant made available from any private or public source to implement the program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-2201 through 8-2205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM