Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention Program
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified health care facility, on or before August 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention committee; requiring a workplace violence prevention committee, on or before October 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention program; requiring a workplace violence prevention program to include specified components; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, on or before July 1, 2014, to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1001 through 5-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM