Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for all or part of a State highway; prohibiting the sale or lease of highway naming rights unless the Administration makes specified determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; providing that a sale or lease of naming rights may not be construed to require that any highway sign or mailing address be altered; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-604, 8-604.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM