Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Table Game Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Oaks, Conway, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that proceeds from certain table games paid to Baltimore City be used for certain purposes to include funding the operation of recreational facilities beyond the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0867
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Game Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Game Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM