Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Establishment of Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and Naturopathic Formulary
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council within the State Board of Physicians; requiring the Council to develop and recommend to the Board a specified formulary to include nonprescription drugs and devices, prescription oxygen and auto-injectable epinephrine and specified contraceptive devices; requiring the Council to provide specified reviews of the formulary, and make specified recommendations to the Board; requiring the Board to adopt a specified formulary; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844737/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {844737/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5F-01, 14-5F-04.1, 14-5F-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM