Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain costs for services provided are eligible to be included in a vehicle's "dealer processing charge"; repealing certain vehicle dealer price disclosure requirements for dealer processing and freight charges; requiring vehicle dealers to disclose the amount of a dealer processing charge in a certain manner and file with the Motor Vehicle Administration certain notice of the amount of a dealer processing charge; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Dealer Processing and Freight Charges
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-311.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM