Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elementary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Edwards, Getty, Jacobs, Jennings, Muse, Reilly, Shank, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county superintendent of schools to enter into an agreement with an appropriate law enforcement agency to provide a full-time school resource officer to each public elementary and secondary school; providing that additional funding required for school resource officers shall be paid from the Education Trust Fund from funds allocated from a specified source; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM