Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified wages paid by specified small businesses to specified qualified veteran employees; prohibiting a small business from claiming the credit for a qualified veteran employee who is hired to replace a laid-off or striking employee; requiring the Department of Commerce, on application of a small business, to issue a tax credit certificate under specified circumstances; providing that the total amount of credit certificates issued may not exceed $500,000; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {569231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {569231/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page