Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop and implement a specified transfer agreement for students who earn an associate of science degree in dental hygiene or medical laboratory technology at an institution of higher education that has received a certificate of approval to operate in the State whereby at least 60 credits earned as part of the degree are transferable to a public senior higher education institution in the State for credit towards a bachelor's degree; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207.1, 18-405, 18-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM