Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence to provide certain grants to counties for use to house homeless veterans and survivors of domestic violence; authorizing the Governor to include funding in the budget for FY 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter for the Program; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to distribute grants to counties and to establish grant application procedures; authorizing the Department to establish preferences for certain counties; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0672
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {249533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {249533/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text - Chapter - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2501 through 4-2505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM