Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center in the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to appoint certain coordinators to the Technical Assistance Center; requiring the Technical Assistance Center to take certain actions; establishing the Collaborative Planning and Implementation Committee for the Technical Assistance Center; providing for the membership of the Collaborative Committee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM