Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Norman, and Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Cecil County and Garrett County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings engaged in agritourism from a specified permit requirement; providing that no more than 200 people at one time be allowed to occupy a building engaged in agritourism; and requiring that the total width of means of egress meets or exceeds a specified standard that applies to egress components other than stairways in a building without a sprinkler system in Cecil County and Garrett County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1547
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {514533/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 48
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {640115/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM