Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health, by a certain date each year, to identify a certain number of certain prescription drugs on which the State spends a certain amount of money; requiring the Secretary to require a certain pharmaceutical manufacturer to report certain cost changes and expenditures during a certain period of time; requiring the Secretary, by a certain date each year, to publish a report on the Maryland Department of Health's website based on the information the Secretary receives under certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0920
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1001, 2-1002 )
(   15-144, 15-145, 15-1601, 15-1612.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM