Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting to $150 the fee that may be charged for a food processing plant license under specified provisions of law to specified farms and civic and nonprofit organizations that process animals for human consumption.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-301, 21-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM