Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland College Education Export Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Dyson, Ferguson, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Higher Education Commission to enter into the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement; exempting specified institutions that participate in the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement from the requirement to register with the Commission if they enroll Maryland students in a fully online distance education program in the State; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-105, 11-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM