Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Young
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Frederick County; requiring the salary of the State's Attorney for Frederick County to increase in a percentage equal to the average annual increment and salary adjustment given to Frederick County employees over the State's Attorney's prior 4-year term; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (88-50)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (88-50) 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM